House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: June 19, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 107.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 89, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Riser, and Adley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Connick, Robideaux, and Harrison.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|