House
|
07/01/2015
|
Becomes Act No. 470.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments (7-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|