House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported with amendments (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|