House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 109.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Stokes, Robideaux, and Ivey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Adley, and Claitor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|