House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 39. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported without amendments (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably (9-4). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|