House | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Prefiled. |