House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015. | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Reported favorably (12-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/27/2015. | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | ||
House | 02/27/2015 | Prefiled. |