Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 17 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2015
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|