House | 05/05/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported with amendments (18-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |