Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB480 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            HLS 15RS-602	ORIGINAL
2015 Regular Session
HOUSE BILL NO. 480
BY REPRESENTATIVE JAY MORRIS
TAX/INCOME-CREDIT:  Reduces the amount and duration of the refundable income tax
credit for a solar energy system
1	AN ACT
2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:6030(B)(1), (2)I(introductory paragraph) and (a), (b)(iii), and
3 (c), relative to tax credits; to provide with respect to refundable income tax credits;
4 to provide for the amount of  the solar energy system tax credit; to provide for the
5 sunset of the tax credit; to provide for applicability; to provide for effectiveness; and
6 to provide for related matters.
7Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:
8 Section 1.  R.S. 47:6030(B)(1), (2)(introductory paragraph) and (a), (b)(iii), and (c)
9are hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 
10 ยง6030.  Solar energy systems tax credit
11	*          *          *
12	B.(1)  The tax credit for the purchase and installation of a system at a
13 Louisiana residence or for a system which is already installed in a newly constructed
14 home located in Louisiana shall be equal to fifty forty percent of the first twenty-five
15 thousand dollars of the cost of a system that is purchased and installed on or after
16 January 1, 2008, and before January 1, 2018 2017.  There shall be no tax credits
17 authorized, issued, or granted as provided in this Paragraph for systems installed
18 after December 31, 2017 2016.
19	(2)  Leased systems. Tax credits authorized under this Section for the
20 purchase and installation of a system at a Louisiana residence by a third party
Page 1 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-602	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 480
1 through a lease with the owner of the residence shall be subject to the following
2 provisions.:
3	(a)  The tax credit shall be equal to fifty percent of the first twenty-five
4 thousand dollars of the cost of purchase for a system installed before January 1,
5 2014.  For a system installed on or after January 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2018
6 2017, the tax credit shall be equal to thirty-eight thirty percent of the first twenty-five
7 thousand dollars of the cost of purchase.
8	(b)  The purchase and installation of a system shall be eligible for a tax credit
9 under following circumstances:
10	*          *          *
11	(iii)  For a system purchased and installed on or after July 1, 2015, and before
12 January 1, 2018 2017, the system shall cost no more than two dollars per watt and 
13 provide for no more than six kilowatts of energy.
14	(c)  There shall be no tax credits authorized, issued, or granted as provided
15 in this Paragraph for systems installed after December 31, 2017 2016.
16	*          *          *
17 Section 2.  The provisions of this Act shall become effective August 1, 2015, and be
18applicable to taxable periods beginning on and after August 1, 2015.
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services.  It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument.  The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
HB 480 Original 2015 Regular Session	Jay Morris
Abstract:  Reduces the amount of the refundable income tax credit for a solar energy
system from 50% to 40% of the cost of a purchased system, and from 38% to 30%
for a leased system, and changes the sunset date from Dec. 31, 2017, to Dec. 31,
2016.
Solar system purchased by the homeowner
Present law provides a refundable income tax credit for the purchase and installation of a
solar energy system at a La. residence, or for a system which is already installed in a newly
constructed home located in La.  The amount of the credit is equal to 50% of the first
$25,000 of the cost of a system purchased and installed on or after Jan. 1, 2008, and before
Jan. 1, 2018.  Authority for this tax credit sunsets on Dec. 31, 2017, with no credits
authorized or granted for systems installed after that date. 
Page 2 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions. HLS 15RS-602	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 480
Proposed law  changes present law by reducing the amount of the credit from 50% to 40%
of the cost of the system, and changes the date of the sunset for the program from Dec. 31,
2017, to Dec. 31, 2016.
Solar system purchased by a third party for lease to the homeowner
Present law provides a refundable income tax credit for a solar energy system purchased and
installed by a third party through a lease with the owner of the La. residence upon which it
will be installed.  For systems installed on or after Jan. 1, 2014, and before Jan. 1, 2018, the
credit is equal to 38% of the first $25,000 of the "cost of purchase".  Further, the "cost of
purchase" is limited as follows:   
(1)On or after July 1, 2013, and before July 1, 2014, the system shall cost no more than
$4.50 per watt.
(2)On or after July 1, 2014, and before July 1, 2015, the system shall cost no more than
$3.50 per watt.
(3)On or after July 1, 2015, and before Jan. 1, 2017, the system shall cost no more than
$2 per watt.
Proposed law changes present law by reducing the amount of the credit from 38% to 30%
of the cost of the system, and changes the date of the sunset for the program from Dec. 31,
2017, to Dec. 31, 2016.
Proposed law is applicable to taxable periods beginning on and after Aug. 1, 2015.
Effective Aug. 1, 2015.
(Amends R.S. 47:6030(B)(1), (2)(intro. para.) and (a), (b)(iii), and (c))
Page 3 of 3
CODING:  Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.