House
|
07/01/2015
|
Becomes Act No. 472.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Morrell, and Alario.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Stokes, Tim Burns, and Ivey.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|