House | 06/01/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 37, nays 53. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |