House
|
06/19/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 22 yeas and 10 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/11/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Jackson, Badon, and Kleckley.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Dorsey-Colomb, Thompson, and Cortez.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 42nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 26 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
By a vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 42nd legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|