Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Appel, White, and Walsworth.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Carmody, Tim Burns, and Edwards.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 26. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported with amendments (12-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably (9-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|