Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 21. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments (7-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported favorably (10-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|