Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported with amendments (12-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |