House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 57. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported with amendments (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|