House | 05/28/2015 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015. | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |