House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 27. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 41. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/21/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|