House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: July 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 128.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 77, nays 22. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Adley, and Martiny.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Ivey, Robideaux, and Stokes.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 1, Senaate amendments rejected, conference comittee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 38. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments (15-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|