Senate | 06/04/2015 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
House | 06/04/2015 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Reported with amendments (16-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |