Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|