Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|