House
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date: July 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 374.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee and concurred in the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Reconsidered the vote by which the House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Alfred Williams, Tim Burns, and Miller.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Amedee, Broome, and Claitor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 66, nays 20, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/06/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|