House | 06/01/2015 | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 50, nays 46. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported with amendments (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title. |