House
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective date: June 19, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 131.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported with amendments (11-5).
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|