House
|
06/29/2015
|
Effective date: August 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 362.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported with amendments (10-4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|