House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 25. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|