Senate | 06/01/2015 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 63, nays 30. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported with amendments (7-6). | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Read by title. |