Senate | 06/01/2015 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported favorably (18-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/13/2015 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/13/2015. | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/11/2015 | Prefiled. |