Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|