House
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date: July 1, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 434.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/10/2015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Gallot, and Long.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Harris, St. Germain, and Hall.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably (9-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read by title.
|
|
|