Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/11/2015. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 750 reported by the Committee on Commerce (8-4). |