House
|
07/01/2015
|
Effective date: January 1, 2016.
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2015
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 436.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 7 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 85, nays 5. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Nevers, Ward, and Appel.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2015
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Hodges, Abramson, and Mack.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 716 reported by the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure (10-0-1).
|
|
|