House
|
06/19/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2015
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/19/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 100 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (13-0).
|
|
|