HLS 15RS-345 ORIGINAL 2015 Regular Session HOUSE BILL NO. 90 BY REPRESENTATIVE RITCHIE TAX/INCOME TAX: Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions for certain tax years 1 AN ACT 2To amend and reenact R.S. 47:293(3), relative to the individual income tax; to reduce the 3 amount of the deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions; to provide 4 for certain limitations; to provide for effectiveness; and to provide for related 5 matters. 6Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana: 7 Section 1. R.S. 47:293(3) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 8 ยง293. Definitions 9 The following definitions shall apply throughout this Part, unless the context 10 requires otherwise: 11 * * * 12 (3) "Excess federal itemized personal deductions" for the purposes of this 13 Part, means the following percentages of the amount by which the federal itemized 14 personal deductions exceed the amount of federal standard deductions which is 15 designated for the filing status used for the taxable period on the individual income 16 tax return required to be filed: 17 (a) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2007, fifty-seven and one 18 half years 2015, 2016, and 2017, seventy-five percent of such excess federal 19 itemized personal deductions. Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. HLS 15RS-345 ORIGINAL HB NO. 90 1 (b) For tax years beginning during calendar year 2008, sixty-five percent of 2 such excess federal itemized personal deductions. 3 (c) For all tax years beginning on and after January 1, 2009 January 1, 2018, 4 one hundred percent of such excess federal itemized personal deductions. 5 * * * 6 Section 2. The provisions of this Act shall become effective for all taxable periods 7beginning on or after January 1, 2015. DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] HB 90 Original 2015 Regular Session Ritchie Abstract: Reduces the amount of the individual income tax deduction for excess federal itemized personal deductions from 100% to 75% for tax years beginning in 2015 through 2017. Present law authorizes a deduction from individual income taxes for excess federal itemized personal deductions. Excess federal itemized personal deductions is defined to mean the amount by which the federal itemized personal deductions exceed the amount of federal standard deduction designated for the filing status used for the taxable period on the individual income tax return. Proposed law reduces the amount of the deduction from 100% to 75% in tax years beginning during calendar years 2015, 2016, and 2017. Proposed law further provides that the amount of the deduction shall be reinstated to 100% for all tax years beginning on and after Jan. 1, 2018. Effective for all taxable periods beginning on or after Jan. 1, 2015. (Amends R.S. 47:293(3)) Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions.