House
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Long, Chabert, and Crowe.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
House conferees appointed: Dove, Schexnayder, and James.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported with amendments (8-7).
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|