House | 06/15/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |