House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|