House
|
06/07/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|