House | 05/07/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2015. | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably (11-7). | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |