Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 82, nays 8. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on May 7, 2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported favorably (17-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2015
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|