House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Read by title, rules suspended, amended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|