House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2015
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read by title, amended, rules suspended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|