House | 06/15/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/04/2015 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 82, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015. | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |