Senate | 06/01/2015 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 102, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. | ||
House | 05/28/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/02/2015. | ||
House | 05/27/2015 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported favorably (14-0). | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported favorably (11-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 04/03/2015 | Prefiled. |