House | 06/09/2015 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. | ||
House | 06/04/2015 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2015 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2015 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |