Senate | 06/09/2015 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/07/2015 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015. | ||
House | 06/03/2015 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2015 | Reported with amendments (11-0). | ||
House | 06/01/2015 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |