House | 06/15/2015 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/10/2015. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2015 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2015 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2015 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/08/2015 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |