House
|
06/15/2015
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2015
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|